MI HB5405 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 313'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 313'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; controlled substances; immunity from criminal prosecution or administrative sanction for prescribing, dispensing, possessing, or administering opioid antagonist; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 7422 & 17744c.
Title
Crimes; controlled substances; immunity from criminal prosecution or administrative sanction for prescribing, dispensing, possessing, or administering opioid antagonist; provide for. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 7422 & 17744c.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Rep. Joseph Graves [R] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] | Rep. Henry Yanez [D] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 506 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 506 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 568 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 506 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 568 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 313'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/14/2014 @ 10:03 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/13/2014 @ 9:34 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:50 Pm |
2014-10-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-01 | House | Roll Call # 506 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2014-10-01 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 568 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 322 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-03-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/12/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Anthony Forlini |
Same As/Similar To
SB0858 (Same As) 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Subjects
Crimes, controlled substances
Criminal procedure, evidence
Health, occupations
State agencies (existing), community health
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Criminal procedure, evidence
Health, occupations
State agencies (existing), community health
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs