MI HB5346 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 65'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Assigned Pa 65'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; child care; reference to mentally retarded and mental retardation; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111).
Title
Children; child care; reference to mentally retarded and mental retardation; modify. Amends sec. 1 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.111).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Assigned Pa 65'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-04-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/28/2014 @ 10:12 Am |
2014-04-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/28/2014 @ 8:05 Am |
2014-03-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:20 Pm |
2014-03-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 128 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-03-05 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 77 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-02-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/21/2014 |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-02-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Phil Cavanagh |