MI HB5241 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-22 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; sex offender registration; registration as sex offender for committing certain prostitution and human trafficking violations; require. Amends sec. 2 of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.722). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4209'13
Title
Crimes; sex offender registration; registration as sex offender for committing certain prostitution and human trafficking violations; require. Amends sec. 2 of 1994 PA 295 (MCL 28.722). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4209'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 185 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-03-27 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 185 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |