MI HB5239 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 344'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 344'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; department of human services to report suspected child abuse or child neglect involving human trafficking to law enforcement; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Title
Children; protection; department of human services to report suspected child abuse or child neglect involving human trafficking to law enforcement; require. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 344'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/16/2014 @ 4:05 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2014 @ 11:54 Am |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:40 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-03-19 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2014-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |
Subjects
Children, protection
Crimes, other
Crimes, prostitution
Law enforcement, other
State agencies (existing), human services
State agencies (existing), state police
Crimes, other
Crimes, prostitution
Law enforcement, other
State agencies (existing), human services
State agencies (existing), state police