MI HB5191 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-7)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Assigned Pa 147'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-7)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Assigned Pa 147'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; off-road; helmet requirement; create exemption for property owner, family member, or guest. Amends secs. 81133 & 81147 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81133 & 324.81147).
Title
Vehicles; off-road; helmet requirement; create exemption for property owner, family member, or guest. Amends secs. 81133 & 81147 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.81133 & 324.81147).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 272 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 272 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 272 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 99 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Assigned Pa 147'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-06-05 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/4/2014 @ 4:30 Pm |
2014-06-05 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/4/2014 @ 1:39 Pm |
2014-06-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/30/2014 @ 9:42 Am |
2014-05-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-05-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-05-22 | House | Roll Call # 272 Yeas 101 Nays 9 |
2014-05-22 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-05-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-05-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmitted |
2014-02-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-02-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 Yeas 99 Nays 9 |
2014-02-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2014-02-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-12-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/11/2013 |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |