MI HB5142 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on November 12 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-12-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; other; fee for commercial look-up service; provide for additional fee for web portal development, and allow private entities to provide a commercial look-up service. Amends sec. 208b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.208b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; other; fee for commercial look-up service; provide for additional fee for web portal development, and allow private entities to provide a commercial look-up service. Amends sec. 208b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.208b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-02HouseRecommendation Concurred In
2014-12-02HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations
2013-11-13HousePrinted Bill Filed 11/13/2013
2013-11-12HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2013-11-12HouseRead A First Time
2013-11-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Michael Mccready

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback