MI HB5090 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 218'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 218'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of soliciting another person to purchase ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for the purpose of manufacturing methamphetamine; enact. Amends sec. 13m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5089'13
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of soliciting another person to purchase ephedrine or pseudoephedrine for the purpose of manufacturing methamphetamine; enact. Amends sec. 13m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5089'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 437 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 218'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:40 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:44 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2014 @ 9:58 Am |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 437 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-05 | House | Title Amended |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2013-10-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/23/2013 |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-10-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-10-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Aric Nesbitt |