MI HB4867 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 350'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Assigned Pa 350'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; offense variable 10 related to the exploitation of a vulnerable victim; expand definition of predatory conduct to include preoffense conduct directed at a law enforcement officer posing as a potential victim. Amends sec. 40, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.40).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; offense variable 10 related to the exploitation of a vulnerable victim; expand definition of predatory conduct to include preoffense conduct directed at a law enforcement officer posing as a potential victim. Amends sec. 40, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.40).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 611 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 450 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 450 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Assigned Pa 350'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/17/2014 @ 2:35 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2014 @ 12:02 Pm |
2014-10-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:18 Pm |
2014-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-10-02 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-10-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-10-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-10-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 611 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2013-12-04 | House | Transmitted |
2013-12-04 | House | Passed Roll Call # 450 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2013-12-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-12-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-12-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-07-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/21/2013 |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Leonard |