MI HB4811 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 62'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 62'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs; other; military family relief fund; revised procedure for application and disbursement of funds. Amends secs. 2 & 4 of 2004 PA 363 (MCL 35.1212 & 35.1214).
Title
Military affairs; other; military family relief fund; revised procedure for application and disbursement of funds. Amends secs. 2 & 4 of 2004 PA 363 (MCL 35.1212 & 35.1214).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 115 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 115 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 115 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Assigned Pa 62'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/27/2014 @ 11:58 Am |
2014-03-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/26/2014 @ 9:14 Pm |
2014-03-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 1:58 Pm |
2014-03-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-03-18 | House | Roll Call # 115 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-03-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2013-10-03 | House | Transmitted |
2013-10-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2013-10-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-09-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-09-26 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2013-09-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-09-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-09-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-06-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/07/2013 |
2013-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2013-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Ray Franz |