MI HB4710 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned Pa 43'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned Pa 43'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; beer; limitation of number of other locations a brewpub may have an interest in and the barrel threshold; increase. Amends sec. 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1603). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4709'13, HB 4711'13, SB 0504'13, SB 0505'13, SB 0506'13, SB 0507'13, SB 0650'13
Title
Liquor; beer; limitation of number of other locations a brewpub may have an interest in and the barrel threshold; increase. Amends sec. 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1603). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4709'13, HB 4711'13, SB 0504'13, SB 0505'13, SB 0506'13, SB 0507'13, SB 0650'13
Sponsors
Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Robert VerHeulen [R] | Rep. Kevin Cotter [R] |
Rep. Bradford Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Andy Schor [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 103 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 103 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 103 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Assigned Pa 43'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-03-26 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/25/2014 @ 4:08 Pm |
2014-03-26 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 2:34 Pm |
2014-03-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/19/2014 @ 10:54 Am |
2014-03-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-03-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-03-13 | House | Roll Call # 103 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 91 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 433 Yeas 106 Nays 4 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/09/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-05-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Macgregor |
Same As/Similar To
SB0426 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform