MI HB4684 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 195'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 195'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; auctioneers; reference to certain auctioneers in definition of snowmobile dealers in NREPA; revise. Amends sec. 82101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4683'13, SB 0476'13, SB 0477'13
Title
Occupations; auctioneers; reference to certain auctioneers in definition of snowmobile dealers in NREPA; revise. Amends sec. 82101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.82101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4683'13, SB 0476'13, SB 0477'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 349 (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 349 (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 85 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 349 (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 (Y: 85 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 195'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/24/2014 @ 9:07 Am |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 4:44 Pm |
2014-06-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/10/2014 @ 11:46 Am |
2014-06-05 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-05 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-05 | House | Roll Call # 349 Yeas 84 Nays 24 |
2014-06-05 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-04 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-04 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 343 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-05-29 | House | Transmitted |
2013-05-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 85 Nays 21 |
2013-05-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-07 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/03/2013 |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-05-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Cindy Denby |
Subjects
Businesses, distributors and dealers
Occupations, auctioneers
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Vehicles, snowmobiles
Occupations, auctioneers
Occupations, business licensing and regulation
Vehicles, snowmobiles