MI HB4612 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Senate Named Conferees 08/18/2015: Sens. Goeff Hansen, Mike Shirkey, Morris Hood
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-09 - Senate Named Conferees 08/18/2015: Sens. Goeff Hansen, Mike Shirkey, Morris Hood
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; registration fees; modify. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801).
Title
Vehicles; registration; registration fees; modify. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 285 (Y: 0 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 (Y: 59 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 08/18/2015: Sens. Goeff Hansen, Mike Shirkey, Morris Hood |
2015-08-18 | House | Referred To Conference Committee 08/18/2015 |
2015-08-18 | House | Senate Conferees Named 08/18/2015: Sens. Goeff Hansen Mike Shirkey Morris Hood |
2015-08-18 | House | House Conferees Named 08/18/2015: Reps. Kevin Cotter Al Pscholka Marilyn Lane |
2015-08-18 | House | Roll Call # 285 Yeas 0 Nays 103 |
2015-08-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Nonconcurred In |
2015-07-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-07-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 348 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2015-06-10 | House | Transmitted |
2015-06-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 238 Yeas 59 Nays 50 |
2015-06-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-06-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2015-06-09 | House | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted |
2015-06-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-05-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/15/2015 |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Roads And Economic Development |
2015-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Eric Leutheuser |