MI HB4568 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 220'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 220'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain alcohol- and controlled-substance-related driving violations; revise. Amends sec. 12f, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4567'13
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for certain alcohol- and controlled-substance-related driving violations; revise. Amends sec. 12f, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4567'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 432 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Assigned Pa 220'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:44 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:50 Pm |
2014-07-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/18/2014 @ 2:42 Pm |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 432 Yeas 98 Nays 12 |
2014-06-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-02-05 | House | Transmitted |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 30 Yeas 100 Nays 8 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-01-30 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-09-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-09-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-04-17 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2013-04-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Eileen Kowall |