MI HB4485 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/14/2015 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/14/2015 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Title
Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 767 (Y: 57 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 01/14/2015 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 3:34 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | House | Roll Call # 767 Yeas 57 Nays 53 |
2014-12-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-17 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2013-11-07 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 Yeas 58 Nays 51 |
2013-11-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended |
2013-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2013-03-21 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/20/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-03-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-03-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Bruce Rendon |