MI HB4484 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-03-27 - Assigned Pa 61'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Liens; other; self-service storage facility liens; revise liability of storage facility, allow for late fees, and allow for additional means of disposing of certain property. Amends secs. 3 & 5 of 1985 PA 148 (MCL 570.523 & 570.525).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liens; other; self-service storage facility liens; revise liability of storage facility, allow for late fees, and allow for additional means of disposing of certain property. Amends secs. 3 & 5 of 1985 PA 148 (MCL 570.523 & 570.525).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 384 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseAssigned Pa 61'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-03-27HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/27/2014 @ 11:56 Am
2014-03-27HouseApproved By The Governor 3/26/2014 @ 9:12 Pm
2014-03-25HousePresented To The Governor 3/25/2014 @ 1:54 Pm
2014-03-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-03-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2014-03-20HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2014-03-20SenateInserted Full Title
2014-03-20SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2014-03-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2014-03-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2014-03-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2014-03-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-03-04SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2013-11-12SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2013-11-07HouseTransmitted
2013-11-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 384 Yeas 89 Nays 20
2013-11-07HouseRead A Third Time
2013-11-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2013-11-06HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2013-11-06HouseRead A Second Time
2013-09-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2013-09-24HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2013-03-21HousePrinted Bill Filed 03/20/2013
2013-03-20HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2013-03-20HouseRead A First Time
2013-03-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Pettalia

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4484
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4484.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBH-4484.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBS-4484.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2013-HNB-4484.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0061.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-09-24-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-11-07-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-03-04-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-03-20-030.htm

Bill Comments

feedback