MI HB4306 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Printed Bill Filed 02/22/2013
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Printed Bill Filed 02/22/2013
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; other; legislative website; require certain information to be available to the public. Amends sec. 204a of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1204a) & repeals secs. 204b, 204c, 204d, 204e, 204f & 204g of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1204b et seq.).
Title
Legislature; other; legislative website; require certain information to be available to the public. Amends sec. 204a of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1204a) & repeals secs. 204b, 204c, 204d, 204e, 204f & 204g of 1986 PA 268 (MCL 4.1204b et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Sean McCann [D] | Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] | Sen. David Knezek [D] | Sen. Samir Singh [D] |
Sen. James Ananich [D] | Rep. Phil Cavanagh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/22/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-02-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Sean Mccann |
Same As/Similar To
SB0067 (Same As) 2013-01-23 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4306 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4306.htm |