ME LD982 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create a Gambling Offset To Enhance the Collection of Child Support
Title
An Act To Create a Gambling Offset To Enhance the Collection of Child Support
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-449), in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-449) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-449) |
2013-06-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence. |
2013-03-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-21 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-03-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |