ME LD890 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-8-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 17 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 17 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Buy American-made Products
Title
An Act To Buy American-made Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #382 (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-19 - House - Enactment RC #393 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Adopt Hah-557 To Cas-303 RC #371 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #309 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Enactment RC #393 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Adopt Hah-557 To Cas-303 RC #371 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #309 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | 17 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 3 Absent |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 382 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-07-09 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Enacted In Senate, June 27, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 17 in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON Tabled pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2013-07-09 | Senate | READ and ORDERED PLACED ON FILE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-557) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) thereto. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) AND House Amendment "A" (H-557) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) AND House Amendment "A" (H-557) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-344) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 393 (Yeas 136 - Nays 6 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-557) thereto.. |
2013-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-557) thereto. |
2013-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-557) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 371 (Yeas 142 - Nays 1 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, House Amendment "A" (H-557) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) was READ. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303). |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (31 -Yeas, 4 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Number 309 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-303) Report ACCEPTED . (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |