ME LD785 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure the Periodic Review and Revision of Statutory Provisions
Title
An Act To Ensure the Periodic Review and Revision of Statutory Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-04-24 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |