ME LD715 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Access to Career and Technical Schools
Title
An Act To Improve Access to Career and Technical Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-223), in concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-223) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-223) |
2013-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |