ME LD35 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 35 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 In Favor and 13 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 35 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 In Favor and 13 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Legal Protection to Hospitals where Admitted Qualifying Patients Use Smokeless Forms of Medical Marijuana
Title
An Act To Provide Legal Protection to Hospitals where Admitted Qualifying Patients Use Smokeless Forms of Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #375 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #264 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #264 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | LD 35 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 In Favor and 13 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 264 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-220). |
2015-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-220) . |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-220) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-01-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-14 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-01-13 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |