ME LD1856 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Conduct a Market Analysis Regarding the Feasibility of Expanded Gaming in Maine
Title
Resolve, To Conduct a Market Analysis Regarding the Feasibility of Expanded Gaming in Maine
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #586 (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #718 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #710 (Y: 71 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Adopt Scs-522 RC #582 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #686 (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #718 (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #710 (Y: 71 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Adopt Scs-522 RC #582 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #686 (Y: 96 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required , in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 718 (Yeas 117 - Nays 27 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-16 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | 29 Yeas - 6 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 586 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 710 (Yeas 71 - Nays 71 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-16 | House | Motion of Representative RUSSELL of Portland to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "C" (S-522) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | 26 Yeas - 9 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 582 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York Senate Amendment "C" (S-522) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-10 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report, in concurrence. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senator TUTTLE of York moved to Accept the Majority Ought to Pass Report , in concurrence. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-09 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2014-04-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-09 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 686 (Yeas 96 - Nays 45 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass pursuant to Public Law 2011, chapter 699, section 3, subsection 5 Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-09 | House | Reports READ. |