ME LD1837 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Former Employees of the Maine Military Authority the Ability To Sue for Severance Pay
Title
An Act To Provide Former Employees of the Maine Military Authority the Ability To Sue for Severance Pay
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Rep. Tyler Clark [R] |
Rep. Carol McElwee [R] | Rep. Robert Saucier [D] | Rep. Alexander Willette [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #631 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #714 (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #584 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #714 (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #584 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 631 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1837 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 In the Affirmative and 13 In the Nagative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-524). |
2014-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-524) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 714 (Yeas 95 - Nays 46 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-524) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-524) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-15 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senator TUTTLE of York moved ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2014-03-31 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On motion by PATRICK of Oxford for the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development REFERRED to the Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-21 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2014-03-20 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2014-03-20 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY |