ME LD1826 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Revise the Income Tax Return Checkoffs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Revise the Income Tax Return Checkoffs

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2012-05-16 (S) TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator ROSEN of Hancock.
2012-04-05 (S) On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
2012-04-05 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-04-05 (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2012-04-04 (S) Ordered sent down forthwith.
2012-04-04 (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880), in concurrence..
2012-04-04 (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
2012-04-04 (S) READ ONCE.
2012-04-04 (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
2012-04-04 (S) Under suspension of the Rules, Reports READ.
2012-04-04 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-04-04 (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-880).
2012-04-04 (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2012-04-04 (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-880) was READ and ADOPTED.
2012-04-04 (H) The Bill was READ ONCE.
2012-04-04 (H) ROLL CALL NO. 291 (Yeas 97 - Nays 45 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) (Vacancy 1)
2012-04-04 (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2012-04-04 (H) On motion of Representative CURTIS of Madison, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2012-04-04 (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2012-04-04 (H) Reports READ.
2012-02-21 (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION, in concurrence.
2012-02-21 (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2012-02-16 (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2012-02-16 (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
2012-02-16 (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
2012-02-16 (H) Representative KNIGHT for the Joint Standing Committee on Taxation pursuant to Joint Order 2011, H.P. 1324 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback