ME LD1816 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Recommendations from the Report by the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability Regarding the Public Utilities Commission
Title
An Act To Address Recommendations from the Report by the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability Regarding the Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #759 (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 759V 96 having voted in the affirmative and 50 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-784), in concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-784) |
2014-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cain of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2014-03-12 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-12 | House | Representative KRUGER for the Government Oversight Committee pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 997, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |