ME LD1697 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding for the Veterans Treatment Courts
Title
An Act To Provide Funding for the Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #727 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #591 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Enactment RC #527 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #591 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Enactment RC #527 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 727 (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-538) thereto |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 591 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-538) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-538) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-538) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-649). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-649), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 527 (Yeas 139 - Nays 0 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-649), in concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-649) |
2014-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2014-01-08 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |