ME LD1683 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Degree and Career Attainment for Former Foster Children
Title
An Act To Improve Degree and Career Attainment for Former Foster Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - Enactment RC #726 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 726 (Yeas 142 - Nays 0 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-539). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-539) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-539) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-753) and INDEFINITELY POSTPONED same. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-753), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. |
2014-04-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-01 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-753), in concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-753) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-753) |
2014-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2014-01-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-16 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2014-01-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-01-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-01-08 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2014-01-08 | House | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |