ME LD1679 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - 33 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - 33 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Appropriate Funds for the Maine Criminal Justice Academy, Code Enforcement Officer Training, Increased Enforcement of Tax Collection, Water Quality Control, Clinical Staff at the Maine State Prison and HIV Prevention Education
Title
An Act To Appropriate Funds for the Maine Criminal Justice Academy, Code Enforcement Officer Training, Increased Enforcement of Tax Collection, Water Quality Control, Clinical Staff at the Maine State Prison and HIV Prevention Education
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Gary Plummer [R] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] |
Rep. Michel Lajoie [D] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Rep. Timothy Marks [D] | Rep. Jethro Pease [R] |
Rep. Corey Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Enactment RC #604 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #590 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #590 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | 33 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 604 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 590 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-540) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-617). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, the Senate, Under suspension of the rules, RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-617), in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-617), in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2014-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-617) |
2014-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2014-02-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2014-02-26 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2014-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gerzofsky of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, in concurrence. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2014-01-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-01-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2014-01-08 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |