ME LD1640 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand MaineCare for Veterans and Low-income Residents
Title
An Act To Expand MaineCare for Veterans and Low-income Residents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #629 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - Enactment RC #716 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #711 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #581 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Enactment RC #716 (Y: 93 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #711 (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #581 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 629 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1640 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 In the Affirmative and 14 In the Nagative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 716 (Yeas 93 - Nays 50 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-464). |
2014-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 711 (Yeas 94 - Nays 48 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 581 21 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently, Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2014-04-15 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of her motion to accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 23, 2013 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |