ME LD1617 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Process for Funding Virtual Public Charter Schools and Full-time, Online Learning Programs in the State
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Process for Funding Virtual Public Charter Schools and Full-time, Online Learning Programs in the State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #544 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #648 (Y: 86 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #648 (Y: 86 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-796) , in concurrence. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-796) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 544 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-796). |
2014-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-04 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-796) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-04 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-04 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 648 (Yeas 86 - Nays 55 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-12-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2013-12-30 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013. |