ME LD1468 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Public Utilities Commission To Study the Potential Benefits and Barriers Involved in Making Renewable Thermal Technologies Eligible for Qualification in Maine's Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard
Title
Resolve, Directing the Public Utilities Commission To Study the Potential Benefits and Barriers Involved in Making Renewable Thermal Technologies Eligible for Qualification in Maine's Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #628 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-19 - House - Adopt Sas-301 RC #369 (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #368 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Adopt Sas-301 RC #312 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Adopt Sas-301 RC #369 (Y: 93 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #368 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Adopt Sas-301 RC #312 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 20 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 628 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1468 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In the Affirmative and 15 In the Nagative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2014-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-14 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-510). |
2014-04-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-04-10 | House | Senate Amendment "B" (S-510) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-04-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-04-10 | House | Report was READ and REJECTED. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-510) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Senate Amendment "B" (S-510) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2014-04-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Report Rejected |
2014-04-09 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-23 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-01-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York Tabled pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order . |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-301). |
2013-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 369 (Yeas 93 - Nays 53 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-301) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, Committee Amendment "A" (S-253) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-253) was READ. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 368 (Yeas 94 - Nays 52 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-301) . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-18 | Senate | (26 -Yeas, 9 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Roll Call Number 312 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, Senate Amendment "A" (S-301) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING IN ONE HOUR. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Senator KATZ of Kennebec Objected to SUSPENSION OF THE RULES to give this Bill its second reading. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Committee Amendment "A" (S-253) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-253) READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-14 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed |