ME LD126 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide a Sales Tax Exemption to Incorporated Nonprofit Performing Arts Organizations
Title
An Act To Provide a Sales Tax Exemption to Incorporated Nonprofit Performing Arts Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #32 (Y: 88 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-14 | House | Subsequently, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee of Conference Amendment "A" (S-63). |
2013-05-14 | House | COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee of Conference Amendment "A" (S-63) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Amendment "A" (S-63) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-12) and INDEFINITELY POSTPONED same. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland, the Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-12). |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-23 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor, The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report and JOINED in a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The President appointed the following on behalf of the Senate to the Committee of Conference: Senator HASKELL of Cumberland County, Senator GERZOFSKY of Cumberland County, Senator KATZ of Kennebec County. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended and ASKED FOR A COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended and ASKED FOR A COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-04-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 32 (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-04-09 | House | On motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-04-03 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2013-04-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-12). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-12) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-03-28 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-01-29 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2013-01-29 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |