ME LD1038 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make the State's Uniform Commercial Code Compatible with the Federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Title
An Act To Make the State's Uniform Commercial Code Compatible with the Federal Electronic Fund Transfer Act
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Rep. Jarrod Crockett [R] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Kimberly Monaghan-Derrig [D] |
Rep. Charles Priest [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2013-05-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-05-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-05-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-05-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-14 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |