MD SB997 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from three to four the number of deputy sheriff majors that the Sheriff of Baltimore City is required to appoint.
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff's Office - Deputy Sheriff Majors - Number of Appointments
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |