MD SB985 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Clean Energy Center, in collaboration with the Maryland Energy Administration, to conduct a study of green banks and clean bank financing initiatives; requiring the Center, in conducting the study in collaboration with the Administration, to consult with the Coalition for Green Capital and other specified persons or entities; requiring the Center, in collaboration with the Administration, to submit a specified report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - Study
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-40) (Y: 95 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-40) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447879/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Interest
Loans
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Alternative Energy Sources
Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment
Environmental Matters
Fees
Industry and Technology
Insurance
Interest
Loans
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Transportation