MD SB887 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for specified rights of a State correctional officer relating to employment, investigation, and discipline under specified circumstances; providing for the procedures for the investigation or interrogation of a State correctional officer; establishing procedures for an application for a show cause order under specified circumstances; establishing a specified limitation on administrative charges against a State correctional officer; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Donald Munson [R] | Sen. James Robey [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-04-04 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Colburn) {763529/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-04 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Colburn) {763529/1 Rejected (Y: 11 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (36-102) | |
2010-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-04-10 | Hearing 4/10 at 5:00 p.m. | |
2010-04-10 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2010-04-02 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (44-2) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) Rejected (11-35) | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Evidence
Expungement
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Lie Detection
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Subpoenas
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys
Chemical Tests
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Evidence
Expungement
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Lie Detection
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prisoners
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Subpoenas
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment