MD SB88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Transportation, by resolution of the Secretary of Transportation, to borrow funds to finance the costs of transportation facilities, evidence specified borrowing by the issuance and sale of specified bonds, and pledge and use a dedicated revenue source for the payment of specified principal of and interest on specified bonds; etc.
Title
Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-11-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Bonds
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous