MD SB865 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified meetings of a cooperative housing corporation to be open to the members of the cooperative housing corporation or their agents; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to keep books and records in a specified manner; establishing a specified dispute settlement mechanism for specified complaints or demands arising between specified cooperative housing corporations and their members; etc.
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {650514/2 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appeals
Assessments
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Courts
Eviction
Fees
Hearings
Housing
Leases and Rent
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Rules and Regulations
Appeals
Assessments
Attorneys' Fees
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Courts
Eviction
Fees
Hearings
Housing
Leases and Rent
Notices
Public Information
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Rules and Regulations