MD SB864 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the operation of instant bingo games using electronic machines; altering the definition of "slot machine"; clarifying that a specified handheld device is not considered a slot machine; specifying that provisions of law do not apply to paper tip jar gaming where authorized; authorizing the State Lottery Commission to make determinations regarding gaming devices and requiring the Commission to issue specified regulations; altering the purpose of the Special Fund for Preservation of Cultural Arts in Maryland; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming - Electronic Machines - Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-04 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Floor Amendment (Fisher) {943023/1 Rejected (Y: 62 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - Floor Amendment (Bromwell) Rejected (Y: 61 N: 63 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-04 - Motion vote previous question (Ivey) Adopted (Y: 73 N: 54 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-04 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (116-20)
2012-04-04 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) 943023/1 Rejected (62-73)
2012-04-04 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) Rejected (61-63)
2012-04-04 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ivey) Adopted (73-54)
2012-04-04 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) 743025/1
2012-04-02 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-04-02 Floor Committee Amendment 705863/1 Adopted
2012-04-02 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2012-04-01 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2012-04-01 Favorable with Amendments 155668/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-06 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2012-03-26 Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-03-19 First Reading Ways and Means
2012-04-04 Passed Enrolled
2012-04-04 Third Reading Passed (43-4)
2012-04-04 Senate Concur - House Amendments
2012-03-19 Third Reading Passed (42-3)
2012-03-17 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-17 Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) 253323/1 Adopted
2012-03-17 Favorable with Amendments 909937/2 Report Adopted
2012-03-19 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2012-02-14 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-14 Hearing cancelled
2012-02-08 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-03 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback