MD SB857 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education and specified county boards of education to ensure that specified types of physical education and athletic programs are funded in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Physical Education and Athletic Programs for Students With Disabilities - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994338/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Sunset