MD SB850 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State or any of its instrumentalities or political subdivisions from acquiring mortgages or deeds of trust by condemnation during the period between June 1, 2014, and May 30, 2016; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to conduct a study to identify and evaluate methods, including the use of eminent domain by local governments, for restoring equity to specified homeowners who have been unable to obtain mortgage loan modifications to enable them to keep their homes; etc.
Title
Real Property - Prohibition on Acquiring Mortgages or Deeds of Trust by Condemnation and Related Study
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) {303825/1 Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288872/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288872/2 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Condemnation
Counties
Deeds
Hearings
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Real Property
Reports
Counties
Deeds
Hearings
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Public Information
Real Property
Reports