MD SB806 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the penalty from $500 to $5,000 and terms of imprisonment not to exceed 6 months for a specified offense relating to subjecting a student to the risk of serious bodily injury for the purpose of an initiation into a student organization of a school, college, or university.
Title
Criminal Law - Hazing - Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Schools
Safety
Students
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Harassment
Higher Education
Penalties and Sentences
Private Schools
Public Schools
Safety
Students