MD SB800 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which relief may be provided to a tenant for specified retaliatory actions taken by a landlord of residential property under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-46) (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 556 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-46) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {440216/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Environmental Matters |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {878178/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {878178/1 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |