MD SB795 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness; providing for the appointment of the members and cochairs of the Committee; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to hold specified meetings; authorizing the Committee to hold specified hearings and consider specified votes on specified bills or resolutions; requiring a specified report to be submitted to the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {697979/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
General Assembly
Health
Hearings
Housing
Indigent Persons
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services - Generally
State Government - General Assembly
Veterans
Education
General Assembly
Health
Hearings
Housing
Indigent Persons
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Social Services - Generally
State Government - General Assembly
Veterans