MD SB784 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance of the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of specified higher education loans owed by licensed clinical alcohol and drug counselors, licensed clinical marriage and family therapy counselors, or licensed clinical professional counselors under specified circumstances.
Title
Higher Education - Loan Assistance - Licensed Clinical Counselors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {874939/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Counselors
Fees
Higher Education
Licenses
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Substance Abuse
Comptroller
Counselors
Fees
Higher Education
Licenses
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Substance Abuse