MD SB716 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified rules and regulations for licensing and operating child care centers to promote proper nutrition and developmentally appropriate practices by establishing specified training and policies promoting breast-feeding, requiring compliance with specified standards for beverages served to children, and setting limits on screen time.
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-35) (Y: 98 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-35) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {106688/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634336/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Child Care
Children
Education, State Department of
Food
Health
Licenses
Milk Products
Minors
Records
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Water
Children
Education, State Department of
Food
Health
Licenses
Milk Products
Minors
Records
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Television
Water