MD SB709 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-05 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law concerning a credit against the State income tax for specified easements to allow an individual or a pass-through entity to claim the credit for an easement conveyed to the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, or the Department of Natural Resources under specified circumstances; providing that a grantor of an easement may transfer a specified tax credit by obtaining a specified certificate; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {479930/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budgets
Comptroller
Conservation
Corporations
Counties
Easements
Environmental Trust
Estates and Trusts
Farmland
Fees
Income Tax
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Budgets
Comptroller
Conservation
Corporations
Counties
Easements
Environmental Trust
Estates and Trusts
Farmland
Fees
Income Tax
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income