MD SB660 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from surgically devocalizing a dog or cat; authorizing a licensed veterinarian to surgically devocalize a dog or cat under specified circumstances; providing penalties for a violation of the Act of, for a first offense, imprisonment not to exceed 90 days or a fine not to exceed $1,000 or both and, for subsequent offenses, imprisonment not to exceed 1 year or a fine not to exceed $2,000 or both; etc.
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-5) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172816/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548779/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Veterinarians
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Veterinarians