MD SB647 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stating specified findings of the General Assembly; declaring a specified policy of the State; prohibiting specified institutions of higher education from using funds for specified purposes; and requiring a specified reduction to State funds under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2014-02-11SenateHearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
2014-03-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2014-02-07SenateHearing cancelled (Budget and Taxation)
2014-03-11SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2014-02-03SenateReassigned to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-19SenateHearing cancelled
2014-02-19SenateHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback