MD SB64 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the juvenile court to inquire as to the educational stability of a child at specified hearings and proceedings; and authorizing the juvenile court to consider specified factors in determining the educational stability of a child.
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-3) (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-3) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |